EP0945677 - Flame stabilizing fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morford, Stephen A 1112 Keystone Drive Apt. E Jupiter Florida 33458 / US | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302276.3 | 24.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | US19980046903 | 24.03.1998 Original published format: US 46903 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945677 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945677 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945677 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F23C7/00, F23D14/78, F23D14/22, F23D14/02 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
F23D14/02 (EP,US);
F23C7/002 (EP,US);
F23D14/22 (EP,US);
F23D14/78 (EP,US);
F23C2900/07002 (EP,US);
F23D2204/00 (EP,US);
F23D2900/14021 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/39] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brennstoffeinspritzvorrichtung mit Flammenstabilisierung | [1999/39] | English: | Flame stabilizing fuel injector | [1999/39] | French: | Injecteur de combustible avec stabilisation de la flamme | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 20.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2406725 (PROIZV OB [SU]); | [A]EP0548908 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * column 7, line 14 - line 39; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0638769 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]); | [XA]WO9522033 (SOLAR TURBINES INC [US]) [X] 9 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 15 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 23 * * figure 2 * [A] 1,8,10; | [A]US5502894 (BURKE THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 9; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9619699 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 20 * * page 7, line 6 - line 37 *; | [A]US5540056 (HEBERLING PAUL V [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * column 5, line 3 - line 24; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0777081 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 14 - line 54 * * column 6, line 11 - line 14 * * figure 4 * | by applicant | US5307643 | US5402633 | US5461865 | US5479773 |