EP0952154 - N-acyl and N-aroyl aralkyl amides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | ||
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Harry Ralph 272 Westwoods Terrace Bristol, Connecticut 06010 / US | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium 1 Eversholt Street London NW1 2DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302284.7 | 25.03.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | US19980081970P | 16.04.1998 Original published format: US 81970 P | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0952154 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0952154 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952154 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/38, A61K31/38, C07D295/12, C07D207/09, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D211/26, C07C233/73, C07C323/42, C07D295/08, C07D207/14, C07D213/81, C07D453/02, C07D471/08, C07D487/08, C07D241/42, C07D207/08, C07D263/34, C07D209/42, C07D241/04 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C07D295/135 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1999/43] | C07D333/38, A61K31/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | N-Acyl und N-Aroyl Aralkylamide | [1999/43] | English: | N-acyl and N-aroyl aralkyl amides | [1999/43] | French: | N-acyl et N-aroyl aralkyl amides | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9734883 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-24 * see e.g. page 4, formula I, in particular meaning of "Y" *; | [Y]EP0810220 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1-24 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9814433 (PFIZER [US], et al) [A] 1-24* claim 1 * |