EP0945825 - Printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/50] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Akira, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [1999/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302340.7 | 25.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | JP19980079443 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7944398 | JP19990069025 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6902599 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945825 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945825 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945825 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/10, B41J2/21 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/2132 (EP,US);
G06K15/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/25] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckvorrichtung | [1999/39] | English: | Printing apparatus | [1999/39] | French: | Dispositif d'impression | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Request for further processing for: | 15.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.12.2007 | ES | 23.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2008/35] | NL | 12.12.2007 | |
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 12.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0730973 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-10,18 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 40; figures 16,31 *; | [X]EP0798663 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-10,18 * page 2, line 14 - page 5, column 56; figures 5C,7,8 * | by applicant | US4723129 | US4740796 | US4463359 | US4345262 | US4313124 | US4558333 | US4459600 | JPS59123670 |