EP0949586 - Apparatus and method for image data interpolation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakami, Yoshihiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Kuwata, Naoki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302687.1 | 06.04.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | JP19980093740 | 06.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9374098 | JP19980109899 | 20.04.1998 Original published format: JP 10989998 | JP19980123731 | 06.05.1998 Original published format: JP 12373198 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949586 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949586 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949586 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T3/40 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G06T3/4007 (EP,US);
G06T3/10 (EP,US);
H04N1/40068 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/41] | G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/27] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Interpolation von Bilddaten | [1999/41] | English: | Apparatus and method for image data interpolation | [1999/41] | French: | Dispositif et méthode d'interpolation de données d'image | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0367418 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-18 * claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]US5327257 (HRYTZAK RANDAL K [CA], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [Y]EP0709825 (HARRIS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 3, line 4 - line 7 *; | [Y]WO9616380 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - line 26 * | Examination | EP0710925 |