EP0949838 - Architecture repartitioning to simplify outside-plant component of fibre-based access system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graves, Alan Frank 22 Appaloosa Drive Kanata, Ontario K2M 1N7 / CA | 02 /
Morris, Todd Douglas 5 Valerie Street Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1L2 / CA | 03 /
Ellis, Donald Russels 1131 Field Street Ottawa, Ontario K2C 2P6 / CA | [1999/42] |
Former [1999/41] | 01 /
Graves, Alan Frank 22 Appaloosa Drive Kanata, Ontario K2M 1N7 / CA | ||
02 /
Morris, Todd Douglas 231 McCurdy Drive Kanata, Ontario K2L 2L5 / CA | |||
03 /
Ellis, Donald Russels 1131 Field Street Ottawa, Ontario K2C 2P6 / CA | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Cage, John David, et al Nortel Networks, IP Law Group, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302713.5 | 07.04.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | US19980056096 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: US 56096 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949838 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949838 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949838 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04Q11/04, H04L12/56, H04J3/16 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0062 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5605 (EP,US);
H04L2012/567 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0067 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0071 (EP,US);
Y10S370/907 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/41] | H04Q11/00, H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/16] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verteilte Architektur zur Vereinfachung der externe Anlage von ein auf optischen Faser basiertes Zugangssystem | [1999/41] | English: | Architecture repartitioning to simplify outside-plant component of fibre-based access system | [1999/41] | French: | Architecture répartie, pour la simplification de l'installation externe d'un système d'accès, basée sur des fibres optiques | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9210037 (JACOBS GORDON M [US]) [A] 18* page 27, line 1 - page 28, line L *; | [XA]WO9619089 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [X] 18 * the whole document * [A] 1-17; | [A]EP0762687 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 25 - line 40 * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 31 *; | [X]EP0783221 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 23 - line 43; figure 4 *; | [A]US5666487 (GOODMAN WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 4, line 9 - line 14 * * column 5, line 35 - line 55 * * column 8, line 51 - line 55 * * figure 1 * |