EP0957118 - Thermosetting resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states NISSHINBO INDUSTRIES, INC. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho, 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amano, Satoshi, c/o Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. Tokyo Research Center, 18-1 NishiArai Sakae-cho 1-chome, Adachi-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tomita, Hideshi, c/o Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. Tokyo Research Center, 18-1 NishiArai Sakae-cho 1-chome, Adachi-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302879.4 | 13.04.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | JP19980127965 | 11.05.1998 Original published format: JP 12796598 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0957118 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0957118 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957118 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/02, C08L63/00, C08L79/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
C08L79/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/025 (EP,US);
C08G59/4042 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L79/00, C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C09D163/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/37] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmehärtbare Harzzusammensetzung | [1999/46] | English: | Thermosetting resin composition | [1999/46] | French: | Composition de résine thermodurcissable | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5321101 (SUZUKI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * claims 1,4,5,7,16,19,20,26 *; | [A]EP0515161 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4 * claims 1,9 *; | [A]US5576398 (TAKAHASHI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6 * claims 1,8 *; | [D]JPH0881545 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) |