EP1009067 - Connector structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAICHI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states YAMAICHI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Yoshiharu 4-30-12-603, Tsurumichuoh, Tsurumi-ku Yokahama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99302998.2 | 19.04.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | JP19980351879 | 10.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35187998 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1009067 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1009067 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1009067 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/646 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
H01R24/50 (EP,US);
H01R13/7031 (EP,US);
H01R12/716 (EP,US);
H01R13/2421 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
Y10S439/944 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/15] |
Former [2002/20] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steckeranordnung | [2000/24] | English: | Connector structure | [2000/24] | French: | Structure de connecteur | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 27.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1285548 (RADIALL SA [FR]) [A] 2 * page 3, line 69 - line 127 *; | [A]US5474466 (SAKURAOKA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 3* column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 39; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5662480 (TOGASHI KOUJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 18 - column 12, line 24 *; | [A]WO9843323 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 23 - page 8, line 10 * |