EP0959439 - Modular self service terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henderson, Jim 45 Watts Gardens Cupar, Fife KY15 4UG, Scotland / GB | 02 /
Wiggins, Timothy 55 Meadowview Drive Inchture, Perth PH14 9TQ, Scotland / GB | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1999/47] | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303210.1 | 26.04.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | GB19980011069 | 23.05.1998 Original published format: GB 9811069 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959439 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G07F9/10 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
G07D11/40 (EP,US);
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G07F19/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/31] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Modulares Selbstbedienungsterminal | [1999/47] | English: | Modular self service terminal | [1999/47] | French: | Terminal self-service modulaire | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/32] | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9729444 (INTERBOLD [US]) [A] 1-4,7-9 * page 7, line 10 - page 11, line 19 *; | [A]GB2025106 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,3-5,7,8 * page 1, line 107 - page 2, line 71 *; | [A]US4813475 (COUVRETTE EDWARD F [US]) [A] 5-7 * column 2, line 11 - line 68; figure - *; | [A]EP0375884 (TECNOMET SPA [IT]) [A] 1,2,9 * claim - *; | [A] - "AUTOMATIC TRANSACTION FACILITY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19850801), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8689, page 1032, XP002058709 |