EP0953393 - An insert for pour-around die casting, a rust preventive oil therefor and a method of using the insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIPI INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 1, Chuo-Kogyo-Danchi Sagae-shi Yamagata / JP | For all designated states Teikoku Piston Ring Co., Ltd. 1-8-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Teipi Industry Co., Ltd. 1, Chuo-Kogyo-Danchi Sagae-shi, Yamagata / JP | ||
For all designated states Teikoku Piston Ring Co., Ltd. 1-8-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Teipi Industry Co., Ltd. 1, Chuo-Kogyo-Danchi Sagae-shi, Yamagata / JP | ||
For all designated states Teikoku Piston Ring Co. Ltd. 1-8-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states Teipi Industry Co., Ltd. 1, Chuo-Kogyo-Danchi Sagae-shi, Yamagata / JP | ||
For all designated states TEIKOKU PISTON RING CO. LTD. 9-9, Yaesu 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Takahiro 1-202, 3-11-15, Hinoki-cho Yamagata-shi, Yamagata / JP | 02 /
Saito, Giichiro 7-30-B5, Senami 1-chome Yamagata-shi, Yamagata / JP | 03 /
Nobumoto, Akinari 610, Amakoda 1-chome, Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/44] | Skailes, Humphrey John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303269.7 | 27.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | JP19980119136 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11913698 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0953393 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953393 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B22D19/00, C23F11/00 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
B22D19/00 (EP,US);
C23F11/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12556 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12757 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/31] |
Former [2000/28] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zu umgiessendes Einlegeteil für Druckguss, dazugehörendes Rostschutzöl und Methode zum Gebrauch des Einlegeteils | [1999/44] | English: | An insert for pour-around die casting, a rust preventive oil therefor and a method of using the insert | [1999/44] | French: | Insert utilisé dans le moulage par injection, huile de protection contre la rouille associée et methode pour l'utilisation de cet insert | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 25.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 29.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07118686 ; | [A]JPS5871998 ; | [A]JPS6318086 ; | [A]JPH09241801 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 095, no. 008, & JP07118686 A 19950509 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830715), vol. 007, no. 161, Database accession no. (C - 176), & JP58071998 A 19830428 (NIHON RUUBU KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880624), vol. 012, no. 223, Database accession no. (C - 507), & JP63018086 A 19880125 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 098, no. 001, & JP09241801 A 19970916 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * |