EP0961195 - Function for mapping the keys of a keypad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIEBOLD, INCORPORATED 5995 Mayfair Road North Canton, OH 44720 / US | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jay Paul Drummond 3205 Roanoke Street NW Massillon, Ohio 44646 / US | 02 /
Dale Blackson 5056 Paddington Dowen Street Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | 03 /
Cichon, Bob A 2112 Tennyson N.E. 6 Massillon, Ohio 44646 / US | 04 /
Mark A Moales 5162 Bundoran Street North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | 05 /
Mark D Smith 1910 Hunting vallcy NW North Canton, Ohio44720 / US | 06 /
Joseph C Ess 220 Wilbur Drive NE 10 North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | 07 /
David W Weis 842 McKinley Boulevard Ashland, Ohio 44805 / US | 08 /
James Church 741 Governor's Circle Kent, Ohio 44240 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1999/48] | 01 /
Jay Paul Drummond 3205 Roanoke Street NW Massillon, Ohio 44646 / US | ||
02 /
Dale Blackson 5056 Paddington Dowen Street Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | |||
03 /
Cichon, Bob A 2112 Tennyson N.E. #6 Massillon, Ohio 44646 / US | |||
04 /
Mark A Moales 5162 Bundoran Street North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | |||
05 /
Mark D Smith 1910 Hunting vallcy NW North Canton, Ohio44720 / US | |||
06 /
Joseph C Ess 220 Wilbur Drive NE#10 North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | |||
07 /
David W Weis 842 McKinley Boulevard Ashland, Ohio 44805 / US | |||
08 /
James Church 741 Governor's Circle Kent, Ohio 44240 / US | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1999/48] | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303411.5 | 30.04.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | US19980077337 | 27.05.1998 Original published format: US 77337 | US19980091887P | 07.07.1998 Original published format: US 91887 P | US19980095626P | 07.08.1998 Original published format: US 95626 P | US19980098907P | 02.09.1998 Original published format: US 98907 P | US19980193624 | 17.11.1998 Original published format: US 193624 | [2000/26] |
Former [1999/48] | US19980077337 | 27.05.1998 | |
US19980091887P | 07.07.1998 | ||
US19980095626P | 07.08.1998 | ||
US19980098907P | 02.09.1998 | ||
US19980193624 | 17.09.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961195 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0961195 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06F3/023 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/023 (EP);
G06F16/95 (EP);
G06F3/04895 (EP);
G06Q20/00 (EP);
G06Q20/042 (EP);
G06Q20/18 (EP);
G07F19/20 (EP);
G07F19/201 (EP);
G07F19/206 (EP);
G07F19/211 (EP);
H04L63/0861 (EP);
H04L63/12 (EP);
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04L67/34 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1999/48] | G06F3/023 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/29] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tastenumsetzungfunktion für eine Tastatur | [1999/48] | English: | Function for mapping the keys of a keypad | [1999/48] | French: | Fonction de conversion des touches d'un clavier | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 19.01.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/26] | 15.02.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5485614 (KOCIS THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 55; figure 1 ** column 9, line 45 - column 11, line 7; figure 1 *; | [X] - "KEY MOUSE MULTIFUNCTION DEVICE FOR RACK MOUNTED PERSONAL COMPUTERS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19950401), vol. 38, no. 4, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 169 - 170, XP000516111 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5706422 |