EP1050786 - Designing and making an article of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erno, Jeffrey David 20191 Capecoral Lane No. 219 Huntington Beach, California 92646 / US | 02 /
Stickles, Richard Wade 819 Carpenter Road Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 03 /
Beauchamp, Phillip Paul 17 Riverwind Drive Rexford, New York 12148 / US | 04 /
Pritchard, Byron Andrew 324 Beech Road Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | [2005/16] |
Former [2000/45] | 01 /
Erno, Jeffrey 20191 Capecoral Lane No. 219 Huntinhton Beach, California 92646 / US | ||
02 /
Stickles, Richard Wade 819 Carpenter Road Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | |||
03 /
Beauchamp, Phillip Paul 17 Riverwind Drive Rexford, New York 12148 / US | |||
04 /
Pritchard, Byron Andrew 324 Beech Road Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303500.5 | 05.05.1999 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050786 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050786 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4097 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
G05B19/4097 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/30] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Entwurf und Herstellung von Gegenständen | [2000/45] | English: | Designing and making an article of manufacture | [2000/45] | French: | Conception ef fabrication d'un article manufacturé | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Request for further processing for: | 31.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5594651 (ST VILLE JAMES A [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-10; | [A]US5177689 (KINASI KATUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5033005 (HASKE CARL [US]) [A] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5309366 (GRENKOWITZ ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5006990 (WARD WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5485390 (LECLAIR STEVEN R [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |