EP0955186 - Pneumatic radial tires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadota, Kuninobu 21-22, Misumi-cho, 1-chome Higashimurayama City, Tokyo / JP | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Whalley, Kevin MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303557.5 | 06.05.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | JP19980142246 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14224698 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0955186 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0955186 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955186 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/20, B60C9/28 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
B60C9/2009 (EP,US);
B60C9/28 (EP,US);
B60C2009/2041 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10765 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10792 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10801 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/29] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Radiale Luftreifen | [1999/45] | English: | Pneumatic radial tires | [1999/45] | French: | Bandages pneumatiques radiaux | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 14.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4669520 (KOSEKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 40 - line 44 * * column 3, line 2 - line 5 * * column 3, line 19 - line 23; figure 4A; claims 1,2 *; | [X]GB2017019 (SEMPERIT AG) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 113 - page 2, line 52; figure - *; | [X]EP0698509 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 6 - line 36; figures 1B,2B; claim - *; | [XA]EP0581503 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 7 - line 10; figures 1,3 * [A] 5; | [X]US5111864 (NAKANO MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 27; figure 1 *; | [X]JPS50132604 (.............) [X] 1,6-8 * figure 2 *; | [A]JPH0367703 ; | [A]LU87862 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE3327670 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,6-8 * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910610), vol. 015, no. 225, Database accession no. (M - 1122), & JP03067703 A 19910322 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |