Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000141608 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US18965598 | 10.11.1998 | US25659699 | 23.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1000739 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2002 | A3 | EP1000739 | 17.05.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18965598 | 10.11.1998 | US25659699 | 23.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6142078 | 07.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US18965598 | 10.11.1998 | US25659699 | 23.02.1999 |