EP0957630 - Column amplifier architecture in an active pixel sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street, M/S 20BN Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borg, Matthew M. 796 NW Fox Place Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 02 /
Moore, Charles E. 425 W 10th Street Loveland, CO 80537 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/30] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303595.5 | 07.05.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | US19980076014 | 11.05.1998 Original published format: US 76014 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0957630 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0957630 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957630 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, H04N5/217 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H04N25/63 (US);
H01L27/14643 (EP,US);
H04N25/616 (EP,US);
H04N25/67 (EP);
H04N25/75 (EP,US);
H04N25/78 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/02] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spalteverstärkerarchitektur in einem aktiven Pixelsensor | [1999/46] | English: | Column amplifier architecture in an active pixel sensor | [1999/46] | French: | Architecture d'amplificateur de colonne dans un capteur d'image à pixel actif | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 15.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0424111 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [DA]US5471515 (FOSSUM ERIC R [US], et al); | [A]US5663761 (FUKUI HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]EP0813338 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) |