blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0957407

EP0957407 - Toner and image forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.07.2006  [2006/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kasuya, Takashige c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Yoshida, Satoshi c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Ohno, Manabu c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Karaki, Yuki c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Ito, Masanori c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Kukimoto, Tsutomu c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
07 / Yusa, Hiroshi c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
08 / Takiguchi, Tsuyoshi c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
09 / Handa, Satoshi c/o
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2005/11]
Former [1999/46]01 / Kasuya, Takashige
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Yoshida, Satoshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Ohno, Manabu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Karaki, Yuki
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Ito, Masanori
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Kukimoto, Tsutomu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
07 / Yusa, Hiroshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
08 / Takiguchi, Tsuyoshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
09 / Handa, Satoshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99303701.912.05.1999
[1999/46]
Priority number, dateJP1998012978013.05.1998         Original published format: JP 12978098
JP1998012978113.05.1998         Original published format: JP 12978198
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0957407
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0957407
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0957407
Date:17.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:G03G9/097
[1999/46]
CPC:
G03G9/09708 (EP,US); G03G9/0819 (EP,US); G03G9/09716 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/44]
Former [1999/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Toner und Bildherstellungsverfahren[1999/46]
English:Toner and image forming method[1999/46]
French:Révélateur et procédé de production d' images[1999/46]
Examination procedure18.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
05.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2005Fee for grant paid
08.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH02166461  ;
 [X]JPH03245158  ;
 [X]JPH05204186  ;
 [X]US5288581  (ZIOLO RONALD F [US]) [X] 1,2,24,28,36 * claims 1-3,9 *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 32, Database accession no. 1990-241585, XP002126694 & JPH02166461 A 19900627 (CANON) [X] 1,2,24,28,36 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 50, Database accession no. 1991-365255, XP002126695 & JPH03245158 A 19911031 (HITACHI) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931122), vol. 17, no. 631, Database accession no. (P - 1648), & JP05204186 A 19930813 (SHARP) [X] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.