EP0967516 - Frame counter device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kameyama, Nobuyuki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Tasaka, Hisashi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Koike, Kazumi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Isozaki, Makoto c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 2-26-30 Nishi-Azabu Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Ishiguro, Masanori c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 2-12-1 Ogi-Machi Odawara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Stevens, Jason Paul, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/52] | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303821.5 | 17.05.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | JP19980142766 | 25.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14276698 | JP19980144694 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14469498 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967516 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967516 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/36 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G03B17/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/42] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildzähler | [1999/52] | English: | Frame counter device | [1999/52] | French: | Dispositif de comptage d'images | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 01.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/37] | 25.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP04017852.7 / EP1471381 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4191463 (ARAI AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 3-31; | [A]US3984852 (JOHNSON BRUCE K, et al) [A] 1,17,24,28 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]JPS58205139 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840313), vol. 008, no. 055, Database accession no. (P - 260), & JP58205139 A 19831130 (FUJI SHASHIN KOKI KK) [A] 1,17,24,28 * abstract * |