EP0959298 - Premixing fuel injector and method of operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sowa, William A. 34 Windham Drive Simsbury, CT 06070 / US | 02 /
Kendrick, Donald W. 185 Pine St. No. 512VM Manchester, CT 06040 / US | 03 /
Chiappetta, Louis M. 15 Bayberry Trail South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99303826.4 | 17.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | US19980080485 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: US 80485 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0959298 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0959298 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959298 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/02, F23D14/82, F23D17/00 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
F23D14/82 (EP,US);
F23C7/00 (EP,US);
F23D14/02 (EP,US);
F23C2900/07002 (EP,US);
F23D2204/00 (EP,US);
F23D2900/14021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/44] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vormischende Brennstoffeinspritzvorrichtung und Betriebsverfahren dafür | [1999/47] | English: | Premixing fuel injector and method of operation | [1999/47] | French: | Injecteur de combustible à prémélange et son procédé de mise en oeuvre | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 24.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 14.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0777081 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1,7,9,12,13 * column 3, line 14 - line 54 * * column 5, line 18 - line 54 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0807787 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1,7,9,12,13 * column 4, line 14 - line 57; figures 1-4 *; | [AP]EP0851172 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [AP] 1,7,9,12,13 * column 4, line 5 - line 17; figure 2 *; | [AD]US5479773 (MCCOOMB EDWARD J [US], et al) | by applicant | US5307634 | US5402633 | US5461865 | US5479773 | EP0849529 | EP0849524 |