EP0964553 - Network resource server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byers, Charles Calvin 3202 Bremerton Lane Aurora, Illinois 60504 / US | 02 /
Cooper, Michael Hirsh 321 S. Clinton Oak Park, IL 60302, Cook County / US | 03 /
Lien, Robert Leroy OS-520 Skyline Drive Batavia, Illinois 60510 / US | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304033.6 | 25.05.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | US19980092777 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: US 92777 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964553 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964553 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/64, H04L29/06, H04Q3/00 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H04M7/1205 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L65/1043 (EP,US);
H04L65/1096 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04Q3/0016 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04Q2213/13093 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13096 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13174 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13175 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13196 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13299 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13342 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13345 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Netzwerkbetriebsmittel - Server | [1999/50] | English: | Network resource server | [1999/50] | French: | Serveur de ressources d'un réseau | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9638018 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * claims 1-18 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9722210 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * page 16, line 22 - page 20, line 30 *; | [X] - RABBAGE R ET AL, "INTERNET PHONE- CHANGING THE TELEPHONY PARADIGM?", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (19970401), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 0265-0193, pages 145 - 157, XP000676853 [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * page 6, column 1, paragraph 4. - page 8, column 1, paragraph 5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018601211460 | [A] - LOW C ET AL, "WEBIN - AN ARCHITECTURE FOR FAST DEPLOYMENT OF IN-BASED PERSONAL SERVICES", WORKSHOP RECORD. INTELLIGENT NETWORK. FREEDOM AND FLEXIBILITY: REALISING THE PROMISE OF INTELLIGENT NETWORK SERVICES, (19960421), pages 1 - 12, XP002043670 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |