blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0987616

EP0987616 - Control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2007Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2007  [2007/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Input Devices UK Limited
1 Embankment Way, Castleman Crossing Industrial Estate Ringwood
Hampshire BH24 1EU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]For all designated states
Advanced Input Devices UK Limited
1 Embankment Way, Castleman Crossing Industrial Estate
Ringwood, Hampshire BH24 1EU / GB
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
Penny & Giles Computer Products Ltd.
1 Airfied Way
Christchurch, Dorset BH23 3TE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Higbee, Derek
12 Shelley Close, Ashley Heath
Ringwood, Hampshire BH24 2JA / GB
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Boden, Keith McMurray, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Boden, Keith McMurray, et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/12]Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99304119.327.05.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateGB1998002002614.09.1998         Original published format: GB 9820026
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0987616
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0987616
Date:12.04.2006
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2006
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/033, G05G9/047
[2006/15]
CPC:
G05G25/04 (EP); G06F3/03549 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/12]G05G9/047, G06K11/18
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2007/02]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuervorrichtung[2000/12]
English:Control device[2000/12]
French:Dispositif de commande[2000/12]
Examination procedure13.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/27]
13.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/28]
09.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2007/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.11.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.11.2006M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5670990  (BIDIVILLE MARC [CH], et al) [X] 1-10,17,23-26 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3407131  (JAEKEL FESSENMAIER CHRISTIAN D) [X] 1,5-7,24-26 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19519941  (WERGEN GERHARD DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,6,23-26 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.