EP0961382 - Method for charging secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koike, Kiichi 1460-29, Yamanishi, Ninomiya-cho Naka-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Murochi, Harumi 1-2-1, Higashiodakano Toyohashi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishiwata, Masahito 116-303, Kagita-cho Toyohashi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Jimbo, Hiroyuki 5-6-18-203, Nakaiwata Toyohashi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Saito, Norio 7-3-1, Higashisonoda-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | ||
Former [1999/48] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304151.6 | 27.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | JP19980145348 | 27.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14534898 | JP19980155530 | 04.06.1998 Original published format: JP 15553098 | JP19990041199 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4119999 | JP19990079108 | 24.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7910899 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961382 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0961382 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
H02J7/0071 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/16] | H02J7/10, H02J7/00 | ||
Former IPC [1999/48] | H02J7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/04] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Laden einer wiederaufladbaren Batterie | [1999/48] | English: | Method for charging secondary battery | [1999/48] | French: | Procédé pour charger une batterie secondaire | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP05011569.0 / EP1598916 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CA2208653 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * page 8 * [A] 2-7; | [A]GB2080642 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XA]FR2644936 (OLDHAM FRANCE SA [FR]) [X] 8,12 * page 4, line 5 - line 12 * [A] ; | [A]US3929505 (BURKETT WILFORD B, et al) [A] 8-12 * abstract * * column 14 *; | [A]US5219676 (BULLOCK NORMA K [US], et al) [A] 8 * abstract * * column 4, line 11 - line 31 *; | [A]EP0351941 (FLUKE MFG CO JOHN [US]) [A] 13-16 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2730358 (LECLANCHE SA [CH]) [X] 17,18 * abstract * * page 5, line 17 - line 23 *; | [A]US5596259 (MINO TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 17,18 * abstract * * column 4 * |