EP0966086 - Integrated protection circuit, method of providing current-limiting and short-circuit protection and converter employing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brkovic, Milivoje Slobodan 4316 Vanderpool Drive Plano, Texas 75024 / US | 02 /
Stefanovic, Milan 336 Pine Avenue, No. B4 Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/51] | 01 /
Brkovic, Milivoje Slobodan 4316 Vanderpool Drive Plano, Texas 75024 / US | ||
02 /
Stefanovic, Milan 10901 Woodmeadow Pkwy No. 222 Dallas, Texas 75228 / US | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1999/51] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304448.6 | 08.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | US19980097970 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: US 97970 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0966086 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0966086 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/12 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
G05F1/618 (EP,US);
H02H7/1213 (EP,US);
H02M3/1588 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/41] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Integrierte Schutzschaltung, Verfahren zur Strombegrenzung und zum Kurzschlussschutz und Digital-Digitalumsetzer der diese benutzt | [1999/51] | English: | Integrated protection circuit, method of providing current-limiting and short-circuit protection and converter employing the same | [1999/51] | French: | Circuit intégré de protection, procédé de limitation de courant et de protection contre les court-circuits et convertisseur utilisant celui-ci | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/20] | 05.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.09.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.09.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2316556 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,9 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |