EP0963824 - Method for forming cross-linked molded plastic bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/50] | Cross-linked molded plastic bearings | ||
[2004/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Depuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | ||
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McNulty, Donald E. 1263 N Shagbark Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US | 02 /
Smith, Todd 14510 Lightning Ridge Run Fort Wayne, Indiana 46804 / US | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Fisher, Adrian John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304482.5 | 09.06.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | US19980088729P | 10.06.1998 Original published format: US 88729 P | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0963824 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0963824 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963824 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29B13/08, B29C43/00, A61F2/02, // B29K23:00 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
B29C67/0037 (EP);
B29B13/08 (EP);
B29C43/006 (EP);
B29C2035/085 (EP);
B29C2035/0877 (EP);
B29C2791/005 (EP);
B29C2791/006 (EP);
B29C43/00 (EP);
B29C43/16 (EP);
B29K2023/0683 (EP);
B29K2105/251 (EP);
B29K2995/0087 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2002/23] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung vernetzter, geformter Kunststofflager | [2004/18] | English: | Method for forming cross-linked molded plastic bearings | [2004/18] | French: | Procédé de preparation des paliers moulés en plastique réticulée | [2004/18] |
Former [1999/50] | Vernetzte, geformte Kunststofflager | ||
Former [1999/50] | Cross-linked molded plastic bearings | ||
Former [1999/50] | Paliers moulés en plastique réticulée | Examination procedure | 06.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04075031.7 / EP1413414 | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9427651 (HOWMEDICA) [X] 1-20 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 5; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9801085 (SHEN FU WEN ;SALOVEY RONALD (US); MCKELLOP HARRY A (US); ORTHOPAED) [X] 1-20 * page 1, line 27 - page 4, line 32 *; | [X]WO9729793 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP ;MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY (US)) [X] 1-20 * page 12, line 7 - page 12, line 36 *; | [X]EP0351866 (HIMONT INC) [X] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9814223 (DU PONT) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 30 *; | [A]EP0729981 (BMG INC) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 17 - page 2, line 37 * |