EP0967286 - Leucine aminopeptidase gene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/52] | Leucine aminopeptidase gene, recombinant dna, and process for producing leucine aminopeptidase | ||
[2000/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIKKOMAN CORPORATION 339 Noda, Noda-shi Chiba 278-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states KIKKOMAN CORPORATION 339 Noda, Noda-shi Chiba 278-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umitsuki, Genryou c/o Kikkoman Corp., 339, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 278-8601 / JP | 02 /
Abe, Keietsu, Tohoku-daigaku Kawauchi-jutaku 2-101, 35, Kawauchi-Motohasekura Aoba-ku, Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-0861 / JP | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304589.7 | 11.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | JP19980164611 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: JP 16461198 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967286 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967286 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967286 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/57, C12N9/48, C12N1/15 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
C12N9/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [2004/08] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leucinaminopeptidase Gen | [2004/33] | English: | Leucine aminopeptidase gene | [2004/33] | French: | Gène pour Leucine-aminopeptidase | [2004/33] |
Former [1999/52] | Leucinaminopeptidase | ||
Former [1999/52] | Leucine aminopeptidase gene, recombinant dna, and process for producing leucine aminopeptidase | ||
Former [1999/52] | Leucine-aminopeptidase | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 30.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9628542 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [A]WO9704108 (ROEHM GMBH [DE], et al); | [PX]WO9851804 (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC [US]) [PX] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9851163 (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-6 * page 56 - page 58 * |