Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.03.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
09.02.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
09.02.2001 | Change - classification | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
11.12.1999 | Change - inventor | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
03.12.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] |