EP0973340 - HVQ compression with an error term [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Uoc H 3831 California Avenue Long Beach, California 90807 / US | 02 /
Claproth, Abraham E. 4550 Overland Avenue Culver City, California 90230 / US | 03 /
Nguyen, Kien T. 2172 El Dorado Street Torrance, California 90501 / US | 04 /
Lee, Chio-hao 2134 S. Kings View Drive Hacienda Heights, California 92745 / US | 05 /
De Queiroz, Ricardo L. 26 Cambric Circle Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 06 /
Lao, Guillermo 5531 Lorna Street Torrance, California 90503 / US | 07 /
Romano, Juan A. 8644 Jellico Avenue Northridge, CA 91325 / US | 08 /
Tsai, Tim S. 117 Monticello Irvine, California 92620 / US | [2000/04] |
Former [2000/03] | 01 /
Nguyen, Uoc H 3831 California Avenue Long Beach, California 90807 / US | ||
02 /
Claproth, Abraham E. 4550 Overland Avenue Culver City, California 90230 / US | |||
03 /
Nguyen, Kien T. 2172 El Dorado Street Torrance, California 90501 / US | |||
04 /
Lee, Chio-hao 2134 S. Kings View Drive Hacienda Heights, California 92745 / US | |||
05 /
De Queiroz, Ricardo L. 26 Cambric Circle Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | |||
06 /
Lao, Guillermo 5531 Lorna Street Torrance, California 90503 / US | |||
07 /
Romano, Juan A. 16041 Dearborn Street North Hills, California 91343 / US | |||
08 /
Tsai, Tim S. 117 Monticello Irvine, California 92620 / US | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304632.5 | 15.06.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | US19980106733 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: US 106733 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0973340 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0973340 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/28, H04N7/26 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H04N19/94 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/03] | H04N7/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HVQ Kompression mit einem Fehlerglied | [2000/03] | English: | HVQ compression with an error term | [2000/03] | French: | Compression HVQ avec un terme d'erreur | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5541594 (HUANG CHIEN-MIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 30; figure 2 * * column 8, line 1 - line 36 *; | [XA]US5450132 (HARRIS RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 55; figure 1 * [A] 4; | [A]EP0701375 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 26 - line 54; figures 1A,1B * | [X] - AL-ASMARI A K ET AL, "A LOW BIT RATE HYBRID CODING SCHEME FOR PROGRESSIVE IMAGE TRANSMISSION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS,IEEE INC. NEW YORK,US, (19980201), vol. 44, no. 1, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 226 - 234, XP000779271 [X] 1-5 * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [0003]; figure 3.A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.663751 | [XA] - GAO C ET AL, "TWO-LAYER VIDEO CODING AND PRIORITY STATISTICAL MULTIPLEXING OVER ATM NETWORKS", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19960623), ISBN 0-7803-3251-2, pages 127 - 136, XP000625655 [X] 1,3,5 * paragraph [00II]; figure 1 * [A] 2,4 |