EP0969210 - Sealed compressor mounted between horizontal and vertical [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scroll Technologies One Scroll Drive, Clark County Industrial Park Arkadelphia, AR 71923 / US | [2006/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Scroll Technologies One Scroll Drive, Clark County Industrial Park Arkadelphia, AR 71923 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sun, Zili 211 North Park Drive Arkadelphia AR 71923 / US | 02 /
Hill, Joe T. 301 Druid Hills Arkadelphia AR 71293 / US | 03 /
Young, Michael R. 204 Roscommon Bristol TN 37620 / US | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Moreland, David, Dr., et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304660.6 | 15.06.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | US19980106700 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: US 106700 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969210 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969210 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/02, F04C18/02 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
F04C29/023 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F04C29/028 (EP,US);
F04C2240/603 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/37] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hermetische Motor-Verdichter-Einheit mit geneigter Befestigung | [2000/01] | English: | Sealed compressor mounted between horizontal and vertical | [2000/01] | French: | Ensemble moteur-compresseur hermétique avec montage incliné à l' horizontale | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07208357 ; | [A]JPH0658282 ; | [A]JPS58192993 ; | [A]JPH0196488 ; | [Y]EP0574104 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5,15,16 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0716231 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,15* column 7, line 52 - line 56; figure 2 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. - , & JP07208357 A 19950808 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-5,15,16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940607), vol. 018, no. 297, Database accession no. (M - 1617), & JP06058282 A 19940301 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,6,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840217), vol. 008, no. 037, Database accession no. (M - 277), & JP58192993 A 19831110 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1,6,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890714), vol. 013, no. 310, Database accession no. (M - 850), & JP01096488 A 19890414 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1,15 * abstract * |