blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969280

EP0969280 - Flexible multi-purpose modular assembly for a family of PGNAA bulk material analyzers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GAMMA-METRICS
5788 Pacific Center Blvd. San Diego
California 92121 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
GAMMA-METRICS
5788 Pacific Center Blvd.
San Diego California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Griebel, Craig A.
11940 Handrich Drive
San Diego, California 92131 / US
02 / Hurwitz, Michael J.
12038 Eastglen Street
San Diego, California 92131 / US
03 / Proctor, Raymond J.
7125 Lipman Street
San Diego, California 92122 / US
04 / Stronski, James P.
2505 Burgener Blvd.
San Diego, California 92110 / US
05 / Tran, Kim-Chinh
11633 Calle Paracho
San Diego, California 92128 / US
06 / Yusuf, Siaka
Dow Chemical Company, 1602 Building
Midland, Michigan 48667 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al
WITHERS & ROGERS, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date99304694.516.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010948402.07.1998         Original published format: US 109484
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969280
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969280
Date:24.07.2002
[2002/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2002
ClassificationIPC:G01N23/221, G01N23/222, G21K5/10, G01V5/00
[2002/30]
CPC:
G01N23/222 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/01]G01N23/221
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/16]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flexible Mehrzwek- Modularanordnung zur Verwendung mit einer Mehrheit von PGNAA Schüttgutanalysevorrichtungen[2000/01]
English:Flexible multi-purpose modular assembly for a family of PGNAA bulk material analyzers[2000/01]
French:Assemblage flexible, modulaire et multi-usage destiné à être utilisé avec une pluralité d'analyseurs de matériaux bruts[2000/01]
Examination procedure03.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/32]
18.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0633467  (GAMMA METRICS [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]US5396071  (ATWELL THOMAS L [US], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5732115  (ATWELL THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.