EP0965987 - Magneto-optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirokane Junji 1-194-16 Minamikyobate-cho Nara-shi, Nara 630-8141 / JP | 02 /
Iwata, Noboru 2613-1 Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0004 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Akira 1-1-45-104 5-chome Suzaku Nara-shi, Nara 631-0806 / JP | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304698.6 | 16.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | JP19980173489 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17348998 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965987 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965987 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965987 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
G11B11/10593 (EP,US);
G11B11/10584 (EP,US);
G11B11/10515 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/09] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetooptisches Speichermedium | [1999/51] | English: | Magneto-optical recording medium | [1999/51] | French: | Support d' enregistrement magnétooptique | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 06.12.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.01.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.12.2006 | GB | 16.06.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/26] | GB | 16.06.2007 | |
FR | 10.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FR | 10.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0652556 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8-11,14,15,19,26 * page 21, line 21 - line 58; examples 12,13 * * figures 5A-6C,18A-20C *; | [X]EP0586175 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8-11,14,15,19,26 * page 25, line 50 - page 26, line 11; example 37 * * figures 31A-36B *; | [A]EP0706181 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,26 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19646896 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,26 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0821354 (SHARP KK [JP]) [DA] 1,26 * the whole document *; | [DA] - HIROKANE J ET AL, "MAGNETICALLY INDUCED SUPERRESOLUTION USING INTERFERENTIAL IN-PLANE MAGNETIZATION READOUT LAYER", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, JP, (19961101), vol. 35, no. 11, PART 1, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 5701 - 5704, XP000732278 [DA] 1,26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.35.5701 |