Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0967376
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
25.05.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
07.02.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.08.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.12.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2005 |
First examination report |
|
28.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.04.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
28.12.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 13.02.2002 [2002/07] |
30.11.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
12.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.03.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
30.03.2001 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
12.11.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |