EP0967376 - Air manifold system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoyer, James Cotrell 11986 Paul Meadows Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45249 / US | 02 /
Beatty, Ronald Clark 7489 Knights Knoll Westchester, Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
Wilson, Gregg Hunt 12031 Gaylord Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45240 / US | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [1999/52] | Goode, Ian Roy GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304813.1 | 18.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | US19980213401 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: US 213401 | US19980090141P | 22.06.1998 Original published format: US 90141 P | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967376 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967376 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/10, F02C7/00, F01D9/06, F02C6/08, F01D17/10 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
F02C7/222 (EP,US);
F01D9/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/52] | F02C6/10, F02C7/00, F01D9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/07] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Luftsammelleitung | [1999/52] | English: | Air manifold system | [1999/52] | French: | Conduit collecteur d'air | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/26] | 13.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0743435 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 7 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US5611577 (MEYER MARK K [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5351473 (SHUBA BRIAN H [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 28 - line 45 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4715779 (SUCIU GABRIEL L [US]) [A] 3 * column 2, line 58 - line 68 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3777489 (GEORGE A, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 11 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4928483 (LEFORT BERNARD [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 25 - line 31 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5399066 (RITCHIE JULIE A [US], et al) | by applicant | US5611577 |