EP0973195 - Silver metallization by damascene method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton, TX 75006-5039 / US | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan, Tsiu C. 1633 Camero Drive Carrollton, Texas 75006 / US | 02 /
Chiu, Anthony M. 2563 Buttercup Drive Richardson, Texas 75082 / US | 03 /
Smith, Gregory C. 9204 Linkmeadow Drive Austin, Texas 78748 / US | [2000/06] |
Former [2000/03] | 01 /
Chan, Tsiu C. 1633 Camero Drive Carrollton, Texas 75006 / US | ||
02 /
Chiu, Anthony M. 2563 Buttercup Drive Richardson, Texas 75082 / US | |||
03 /
Smith, Gregory C. 1505 Shonka Drive Carrollton, Texas 75007 / US | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [2000/03] | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304867.7 | 22.06.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | US19980102431 | 22.06.1998 Original published format: US 102431 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973195 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973195 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L21/288, H01L23/532 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
H01L21/76873 (EP,US);
H01L21/2885 (EP,US);
H01L21/76843 (EP,US);
H01L21/76877 (EP,US);
H01L23/53242 (EP,US);
H01L23/53252 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2000/39] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Silbermetallisierung mittels Damaszenverfahren | [2000/03] | English: | Silver metallization by damascene method | [2000/03] | French: | Metallisation d'argent par procédé de damasquinage | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06076564.1 / EP1732113 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0628998 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,20,21,26,27,31,39 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 19 * * column 3, line 9 - line 42 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 30; figures 2A-D; claims 2,4-6,8 * [A] 9,10; | [XA]US5739579 (CHIANG CHIEN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,20-23,27,31-33,39 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 65 * * column 17, line 52 - column 20, line 23; figures 22-24 * [A] 11,16; | [XA]US5627102 (SHINRIKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 20,21,23,24,26,27,31,32 * column 8, line 21 - column 9, line 5 * * column 14, line 60 - column 15, line 13 * * column 17, line 48 - line 53; figures 3A-E * [A] 1,2,8-11,16,35,41; | [XA]US5763953 (IIJIMA TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 20-22,26-28,31,32,39 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 24 * * column 13, line 1 - line 56 * * column 14, line 33 - column 15, line 18; figures 5A-D,26A-F,30A-G * [A] 1,4,5,8-11,16,35; | [XA]US5723028 (PORIS JAIME [US]) [X] 20,24,28 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 22 * * column 6, line 17 - column 7, line 59; figures 2,3,5,6,7AB * [A] 1-3,5,8,9,11,15; | [A]US3808470 (KNIEPKAMP H) [A] 6,9,12,17,28,29 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 15; figures 5-13 * | by applicant | EP0628998 | US5739578 | US5723028 | US3808470 |