EP0971401 - Method of manufacturing semiconductor devices and a resin molding machine therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apic Yamada Corporation 90 Ooaza Kamitokuma, Togura-machi Hanishina-gun Nagano 389-0898 / JP | [2010/23] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Apic Yamada Corporation 90 Ooaza Kamitokuma, Togura-machi Hanishina-gun, Nagano 389-0898 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyajima, Fumio, c/o Apic Yamada Corporation 90 Ooaza Kamitokuma, Togura-machi Hanishina-gun, Nagano 389-0898 / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2000/02] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304898.2 | 22.06.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | JP19980195723 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: JP 19572398 | JP19990029469 | 08.02.1999 Original published format: JP 2946999 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0971401 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0971401 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971401 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56, B29C45/37, B29C45/46, B29C45/26 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
B29C43/18 (EP,US);
B29C43/36 (EP,US);
H01L21/561 (EP,US);
H01L21/566 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3416 (EP,US);
B29C2043/5825 (EP,US);
B29C43/183 (EP,US);
B29C43/32 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/85 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2924/15311 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/02] | H01L21/56 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL [2002/10] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleitervorrichtung und Harzformmaschine zu diesem Zweck | [2000/02] | English: | Method of manufacturing semiconductor devices and a resin molding machine therefor | [2000/02] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif semiconducteur et machine pour moulage de résine à cet effet | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 13.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2008 | Decision despatched | 29.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 05.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 22.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | FR | 09.08.2010 | GB | 09.09.2010 | DE | 01.01.2011 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/35] | IE | 22.06.2010 | |
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 09.08.2010 | ||
DE | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/28] | IE | 22.06.2010 | |
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
DE | 01.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0665584 (3P LICENSING BV [NL]) [X] 1,3-5,7,11,12,14 * column 2, line 40 - column 6, line 13; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,10; | [Y]JPS61167515 ; | [A]US5280193 (LIN PAUL T [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]JPH06151490 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861213), vol. 010, no. 375, Database accession no. (M - 545), & JP61167515 A 19860729 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 2,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940826), vol. 018, no. 461, Database accession no. (E - 1597), & JP06151490 A 19940531 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 2,14 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0665584 | JPS61167515 |