blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969429

EP0969429 - Cash transaction verification and crediting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.04.2016
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.05.2016  [2016/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR International, Inc.
3097 Satellite Blvd.
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
[2010/13]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nicoll, Kenneth A.
Parkview, 174, Coupar Angus Road, Birkhill
Dundee, Scotland DD2 5PG / GB
02 / Grossi, Mark M.
2c Quarry Road, Muirhead
Dundee, Scotland DD2 5QG / GB
03 / Hutcheon, Alfred J.
50, Dover Cliff Way
Alpharetta, Georgia 30022 / GB
04 / Paton, Grant
26, Strips of Craige Road
Dundee, Scotland DD4 7QG / GB
05 / Rossmann, Wolf D.
Burnbrae Cottage, Bridgend of Lintrathen
Angus, Scotland DD8 5JH / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)MacLeod, Roderick William, et al
NCR Limited
Architecture & Technology
Discovery Centre
3 Fulton Road
Dundee DD2 4SW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]MacLeod, Roderick William, et al
NCR Limited Architecture & Technology Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road
Dundee DD2 4SW / GB
Former [2004/50]Williamson, Brian, et al
NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Former [2004/35]Williamson, Brian, et al
Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Former [2000/01]Cleary, Fidelma, et al
International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Application number, filing date99304909.723.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1998001445104.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814451
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969429
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969429
Date:04.10.2001
[2001/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:G07F7/10, G07F7/04
[2000/01]
CPC:
G07F19/20 (EP,US); G06Q20/042 (EP,US); G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US); G06Q20/108 (EP,US); G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US); G06Q40/00 (EP,US); G07F19/203 (EP,US);
G07F7/04 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/26]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Kontrole und Buchung einer Bargeldtransaktion[2000/01]
English:Cash transaction verification and crediting apparatus[2000/01]
French:Appareil pour vérifier et créditer une transaction en argent liquide[2000/01]
Examination procedure04.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/24]
14.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/18]
20.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/18]
16.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5616902  (COOLEY ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - line 27 * * column 2, line 7 - line 12 * * column 2, line 44 - line 47 * * column 4, line 47 - line 57 * * column 5, line 35 - line 42 * * column 7, line 12 - line 18 *;
 [PX]WO9859308  (CAPITAL SECURITY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1-3,5,6 * figure 20H * * abstract * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 7 * * page 8, line 2 - line 9 * * page 9, line 2 - line 21 *;
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "BILL PAYMENT TRANSFER SYSTEM", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19761001), vol. 19, no. 5, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 1917 - 1919, XP002052866 [A] 1,5,6 * text part, first five lines *
 [A]  - JACKEL L D ET AL, "OPTICAL CHARACTER RECOGNITION FOR SELF-SERVICE BANKING", AT & T TECHNICAL JOURNAL, AMERICAN TELEPHONE AND TELEGRAPH CO. NEW YORK, US, (19950701), vol. 74, no. 4, ISSN 8756-2324, pages 16 - 24, XP000517576 [A] 1,5,6 * Introduction of article, explantion of figure 1 and 1st paragraph of heading "Additional services". *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.