EP0967656 - A solid state optical imaging pixel with a photosensitive resistive load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalnitsky, Alexander 2601 43rd Avenue, Nr. 204 San Francisco, California 94116 / US | 02 /
Bryant, Frank Randolph 2125 Crestwood Place Denton, Texas 76201 / US | 03 /
Sabatini, Marco 1743 Spruce Street Berkeley, California 94709 / US | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1999/52] | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304925.3 | 23.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | US19980103753 | 24.06.1998 Original published format: US 103753 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967656 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967656 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H01L31/00, H01L31/0352 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
H01L27/14665 (EP,US);
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H01L31/0352 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/52] | H01L27/146, H01L31/00 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2002/36] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Festkörper-Bildaufnahmevorrichtung mit einem lichtempfindlichen Widerstand | [1999/52] | English: | A solid state optical imaging pixel with a photosensitive resistive load | [1999/52] | French: | Capteur d'image à l'état solide avec une charge résistive photosensible | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4641169 (INUIYA MASAFUMI [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4782227 (MICHERON FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] * figure 6 *; | [X]US4845355 (NAKAGAWA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 22; figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP0710987 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] * figure 5 * |