blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973017

EP0973017 - Compressor with sight glass for monitoring the lubricating oil level [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]Oil level sight glass for a compressor
[2008/23]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.04.2009  [2009/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CARRIER CORPORATION
One Carrier Place Farmington
Connecticut 06034-4015 / US
[2007/02]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
CARRIER CORPORATION
Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800
Syracuse New York 13221 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Moore, Billy W., Jr.
108 Benwood Place
Hot Springs, Arkansas 71913 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Leckey, David Herbert, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]Leckey, David Herbert, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2001/35]Powell, Timothy John, et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2000/03]Gilding, Martin John, et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date99304990.724.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011426913.07.1998         Original published format: US 114269
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973017
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01F23/02, F16N19/00
[2000/03]
CPC:
G01F23/02 (EP,US); F25B1/00 (KR); F16N19/003 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kompressor mit Schauglas zur Überwachung des Schmierölniveaus[2008/23]
English:Compressor with sight glass for monitoring the lubricating oil level[2008/23]
French:Compresseur comprenant un voyant pour surveiller le niveau d'huile lubrifiante[2008/23]
Former [2000/03]Schauglass für Schmierölzustand in einem Kompressor
Former [2000/03]Oil level sight glass for a compressor
Former [2000/03]Voyant transparent indicateur de niveau d'huile pour un compresseur
Examination procedure04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
14.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/18]
08.12.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
11.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
26.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
12.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0068971  (UNITE HERMETIQUE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 34 - page 6, line 30; figure - *;
 [A]US4557216  (DEMYON THOMAS R [US]) [A] 1,10 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]US5295359  (REILLY JR JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column W *;
 [A]US5758746  (SAGE WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1* column A; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.