blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971190

EP0971190 - Method and apparatus for separating air using vortex tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BOC GROUP, INC.
575 Mountain Avenue, Murray Hill
New Providence, NJ 07974-2082 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
THE BOC GROUP, INC.
575 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974-2082 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mostello, Robert A.
165 Rehill Avenue
Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Wickham, Michael, et al
C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road
Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Wickham, Michael, et al
c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Application number, filing date99304998.024.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998010757230.06.1998         Original published format: US 107572
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971190
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication
No.:EP0971190
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:F25J3/04
[2000/02]
CPC:
F25J3/04248 (EP,US); F25J3/044 (EP,US); F25J2205/10 (EP,US);
Y10S62/903 (EP,US); Y10S62/91 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Luftzerlegung unter Verwendung von Vortex-Rohren[2002/24]
English:Method and apparatus for separating air using vortex tubes[2000/02]
French:Procédé et appareil de séparation des gaz de l'air utilisant des tubes à effet vortex[2002/25]
Former [2000/02]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Luftzerlegung mit einer Wirbelentspannung
Former [2000/02]Procédé et apareil de séparation des gaz de l'air utilisant des tubes à effet vortex
Examination procedure07.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
17.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/38]
11.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2726896  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3775988  (FEKETE L) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 28 - line 32; figure 6; claim - * * column 1, line 43 - line 47 * * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 2 * * column 2, line 45 - line 50 *;
 [A]DE803301  (MESSER ADOLF GMBH) [A] 1-7 * column W *;
 [A]US4257794  (SHIROKOV VASILY I, et al) [A] 1-7 * column 8, line 26 - line 41; figure -; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.