blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969328

EP0969328 - Position detection apparatus and exposure apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2016
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.03.2016  [2016/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Katayama, Shoshi
c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/01]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99305100.229.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998020449603.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20449698
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969328
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969328
Date:08.05.2002
[2002/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationIPC:G03F9/00, G03F7/20
[2002/18]
CPC:
G03F9/7096 (EP,US); G01B11/03 (KR); G03F7/70691 (EP,US);
G03F9/70 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/01]G03F9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2003/05]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Positionsdetektion und Belichtungsapparat[2000/01]
English:Position detection apparatus and exposure apparatus[2000/01]
French:Dispositif de détection de position et appareil d'exposition[2000/01]
Examination procedure25.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
18.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2002
Request for further processing for:09.09.2003Request for further processing filed
09.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.01.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5633720  (TAKAHASHI MASATO [JP]) [X] 1-26 * column 5, line 15 - column 11, line 7 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]JPH06168867  ;
 US5798530  [ ] (OKUMURA MASAHIKO [JP]) [ ] * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 67 * * figure - *;
 [X]GB2131205  (CANON KK) [X] 1-26 * page 2, line 124 - page 4, line 40 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP0509797  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-25 * column 7, line 31 - column 18, line 41 * * figures 1-3 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940919), vol. 018, no. 499, Database accession no. (E - 1607), & JP06168867 A 19940614 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1-26 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.