EP0978975 - Data communications apparatus, method and computer program product implementing data communications protocol with efficient packing of datagrams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | ||
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aldred, Barry K., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intell. Prop. Law, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 02 /
Beaven, Paul A., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intell. Prop. Law, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 03 /
Coleman, Davin M., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intell. Prop. Law, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 04 /
Fisk, Brian P. E., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intell. Prop. Law, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305206.7 | 01.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | GB19980014669 | 08.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9814669 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0978975 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0978975 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978975 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
H04L9/40 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/06] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | Einrichtung für Datenübertragung, Verfahren und Rechnerprogrammprodukt zur Durchführung eines Datenkommunikationsprotokolls mit einer efficienten Bildung von Datagrammen | [2000/06] | English: | Data communications apparatus, method and computer program product implementing data communications protocol with efficient packing of datagrams | [2000/06] | French: | Dispositif de communication de données, procédé et programme d' ordinateur pour mettre en oeuvre un protocol de communications de données avec formation efficace de datagrammes | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 24.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2005 | BE | 05.01.2005 | CH | 05.01.2005 | FI | 05.01.2005 | IT | 05.01.2005 | LI | 05.01.2005 | NL | 05.01.2005 | DK | 05.04.2005 | GR | 05.04.2005 | SE | 05.04.2005 | ES | 16.04.2005 | PT | 05.06.2005 | CY | 01.07.2005 | IE | 01.07.2005 | LU | 01.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
CY | 01.07.2005 | ||
IE | 01.07.2005 | ||
LU | 01.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
CY | 01.07.2005 | ||
IE | 01.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
IE | 01.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
IE | 01.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
NL | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 05.01.2005 | |
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 05.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62214744 ; | [X]JPH0918473 ; |