EP1022269 - Sulfonium salts and method of synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Kumho Petrochemical Co. Ltd. 70, Seolin-dong Chongno-ku Seoul 110-110 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Korea Kumho Petrochemical Co. Ltd. 70, Seolin-dong Chongno-ku, Seoul 110-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Joo Hyeon Chunggu Nare Apt., 105-906, Jeonmin-dong Yousung-ku, Taejeon-city 305-390 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jong Bum Daerim Doore Apt., 101-607, Shinsung-dong Yousung-ku, Taejeon-city 305-345 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jae Young Daerim Doore Apt., 101-307, Shinsung-dong Yousung-ku, Taejeon-city 305-345 / KR | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305297.6 | 02.07.1999 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | KR19990001494 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: KR 9901494 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022269 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022269 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C381/12, B01J27/02 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
C07C381/12 (EP);
C07C303/32 (KR);
B01J27/02 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [2004/02] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sulfoniumsalze und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2000/30] | English: | Sulfonium salts and method of synthesis | [2000/30] | French: | Sels de Sulfonium et procédé de préparation | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 03.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 15.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - V.G. NENAJDENKO, ET AL., "Oxidative properties of triflic anhydride. Oxidation of alcohols and sulphides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19970418), vol. 62, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2483 - 2486, XP002117750 [X] 1-5 * table 2, entries 7,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo9620270 | [X] - A. HARYONO, ET AL., "Synthesis and nucleophilic dealkylation of poly[alkyl- (4-(phenylthio)phenyl)sulphonium trifluoromethanesulphonate]s", MACROMOLECULES, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19980224), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 1202 - 1207, XP000732913 [X] 1,2 * scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma971435i | [X] - R.D. MILLER, ET AL., "Dexoygenation of sulphoxides promoted by electrophilic silicon reagents: preparation of aryl-substituted sulphonium salts", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19881111), vol. 53, no. 23, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 5571 - 5573, XP002117748 [X] 1,2 * table 1, entry 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00258a041 | [X] - E. TSUCHIDA, ET AL., "Photochemical recycling of polyarylene sulphide", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, Royal Society of Chemistry, Letchworth, GB, (19960907), no. 17, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 2091 - 2092, XP002229278 [X] 1 * page 2092, column R, line 12 - line 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/cc9960002091 |