blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971151

EP0971151 - High performance two-ply friction material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.09.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.10.2009  [2009/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2005/27]For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc.
3001 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 5060
Troy, Michigan 48007-5060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lam, Robert C.
5015 Switch Grass Lane
Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al
A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date99305314.905.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011059706.07.1998         Original published format: US 110597
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971151
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971151
Date:29.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16D69/02
[2000/02]
CPC:
F16D69/026 (EP,US); B32B5/02 (KR); F16D2069/009 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0091 (EP,US); Y10T442/602 (EP,US); Y10T442/668 (EP,US);
Y10T442/673 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zweischichtiges Hochleitungsreibungsmaterial[2000/02]
English:High performance two-ply friction material[2000/02]
French:Matériau de friction à hautes performances en deux couches[2000/02]
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
03.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2008Fee for grant paid
03.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
04.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
10.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0854305  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [XP] 1-3,8-11 * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 15 * * page 6, line 50 - page 7, line 8; claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]EP0807766  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [Y] 1-3,8-11 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 40 * * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 50 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 25; claims 1-12 *;
 [Y]EP0766019  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 46 - line 58 * * page 5, line 46 - page 8, line 15 * * page 36, line 56 - page 37, line 4 *;
 [Y]EP0695887  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 58 * * claims 1-13 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.