blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971406

EP0971406 - Chip-sized semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD.
711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi
Nagano 380-0921 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD.
711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita
Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Horiuchi, Michio, c/o Shinko Elec. Indust. Co. Ltd
711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita
Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP
02 / Muramatsu, Shigetsugu, Shinko Elec. Ind. Co. Ltd.
711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita
Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Finnie, Peter John, et al
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/02]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99305365.106.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019046806.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19046898
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971406
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971406
Date:07.03.2001
[2001/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2001
ClassificationIPC:H01L23/31, H01L21/56
[2000/02]
CPC:
H01L23/3114 (EP,US); H01L23/28 (KR); H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L23/49827 (EP,US); H01L23/49838 (EP,US); H01L2224/05568 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05573 (EP,US); H01L2224/16225 (EP,US); H01L2224/16237 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US); H01L2224/73203 (EP,US); H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US); H01L2924/01078 (EP,US); H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US); H01L2924/15173 (EP,US); H01L2924/15311 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/48]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiteranordnung in Chipgrösse[2000/02]
English:Chip-sized semiconductor device[2000/02]
French:Dispositif semi-conducteur ayant une dimension de puce[2000/02]
Examination procedure13.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
05.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/18]
20.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09115964  ;
 [X]JPH1027868  ;
 [X]JPH1084014  ;
 [X]EP0786808  (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10* page 6, column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 46; figures 10,111,17,18 *;
 US5915169  [ ] (HEO YOUNG WOOK [KR]) [ ] * the whole document *;
 US5918113  [ ] (HIGASHI MITSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [ ] * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09115964 A 19970502 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10027868 A 19980127 (ANAM IND CO INC) [X] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10084014 A 19980331 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.