blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979866

EP0979866 - Detergent tablet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ricci, Patrizio
105 Rassel
1780 Wemmel / BE
02 / Bennie, Brenda Frances
34A Delamere Crescent
Cramlington, Northumberland NE23 9FS / GB
03 / Binder, Christopher James
116 St. Georges Terrace
Jesmond, Newcastle upon Tyne NE2 2DP / GB
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/07]Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date99305387.507.07.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateGB1998001552517.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9815525
GB1999001126417.05.1999         Original published format: GB 9911264
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979866
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979866
Date:27.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:C11D17/00, C11D3/22
[2000/07]
CPC:
C11D17/0078 (EP); C11D1/62 (EP); C11D17/0086 (EP);
C11D17/0091 (EP); C11D3/126 (EP); C11D3/1273 (EP);
C11D3/222 (EP); C11D3/3707 (EP); C11D3/3776 (EP);
C11D3/3792 (EP); C11D3/386 (EP); C11D3/38609 (EP);
C11D3/38645 (EP); C11D3/42 (EP); C11D1/72 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Waschmitteltablette[2000/07]
English:Detergent tablet[2000/07]
French:Comprimé détergent[2000/07]
Examination procedure07.07.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
16.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
20.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
31.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
05.10.2000Observations by third parties
21.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
24.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2001Fee for grant paid
02.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01104425.2  / EP1103595
EP03003528.1  / EP1327677
Opposition(s)28.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY31.07.2002
[2004/10]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0466484  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-10,13 * page 4, line 35 - line 44 * * page 6, line 20 - line 22; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0481547  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,7-13 * examples 1-5; claims 1,10-13,22,34-39 *;
 [A]WO9703177  (BENCKISER GMBH JOH A [DE], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * examples 1,2; table 3 *;
 [PX]WO9855590  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,4-10,13* page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 22; example -; claim - *
other   - "BENCKISER", ANNOUNCEMENT BENCKISER, XX, XX, XX, (19961219), page 01, XP002932884
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.