blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974884

EP0974884 - Robot controller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Aza-komanba Shibokusa, Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okanda, Koichi, Room 7-305, Fanuc Manshonharimomi
3539-1,Shibokusa, Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi, 401-0511 / JP
02 / Aramaki, Takeaki, Room 12-305, Fanuc Manshonharimomi
3539-1,Shibokusa, Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi, 401-0511 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Billington, Lawrence Emlyn
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Billington, Lawrence Emlyn
Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99305477.409.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020853209.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20853298
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974884
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974884
Date:23.01.2002
[2002/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974884
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2001
ClassificationIPC:G05B19/425, B25J9/16
[2001/46]
CPC:
G05B19/425 (EP,US); G05B19/4086 (EP,US); G05B19/423 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39134 (EP,US); G05B2219/39137 (EP,US); G05B2219/45104 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/04]G05B19/425
Designated contracting statesDE [2002/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Robotersteuerung[2000/04]
English:Robot controller[2000/04]
French:Dispositif de commande de robot[2000/04]
Examination procedure12.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
21.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2005Fee for grant paid
09.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04003400.1  / EP1431854
EP04025669.5  / EP1517208
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4659971  (SUZUKI HAYAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *;
 [YA]EP0349291  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * page 3, line 62 - page 5, line 55 * * claim 1 * [A] 1-4;
 [XY]EP0540753  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [X] 5 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7;
 [Y]US5343385  (JOSKOWICZ LEO [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 5A * * column 9, line 9 - line 49 *;
 [Y]EP0785492  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS5008832
 EP0457914
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.