EP0974687 - Fibre processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J & D Wilkie (Holding Company) Limited Gairie Works Kirriemuir DD8 4BL / GB | [2001/28] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states WM. R. STEWART & SONS (HACKLEMAKERS) LIMITED Marine Parade Dundee DD1 3JD Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hogan, Brian David 5 Flawcraig Rait, Perthshire, PH2 7RY / GB | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305502.9 | 12.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | GB19980015582 | 18.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9815582 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974687 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/24, D01G15/92 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
D01G15/92 (EP);
D01G15/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2000/41] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Faserverarbeitende Vorrichtung | [2000/04] | English: | Fibre processing apparatus | [2000/04] | French: | Appareil pour le traitement de fibres | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/20] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPD]GB2323099 (STEWART & SONS WM R [GB]) [XPD] 1,2,4,8,9 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9214873 (CARCLO ENG GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 13; figure 1; claims 1-3 * [Y] 8-12; | [Y]DE2011373 (WM.R.STEWART & SONS, HACKLEMAKERS.LTD.) [Y] 8-12 * page 6 - page 8 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 3; figures 1,2,8,9; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0336222 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 45; figures 1,4; claims 1,12 * | by applicant | GB2323099 |