blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976936

EP0976936 - Improvements in and relating to karabiners [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DMM Engineering Limited
Y Glyn Llanberis
Gwynedd, LL55 4EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
DMM Engineering Limited
Y Glyn
Llanberis, Gwynedd, LL55 4EL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hall, Frederick Allan
Tyndrwfwl Waunfawr Caermarfon
Gwynedd / GB
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Lyons, Andrew John, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool
L3 1BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Lyons, Andrew John, et al
ROYSTONS, Tower Building, Water Street
Liverpool L3 1BA, Merseyside / GB
Application number, filing date99305644.916.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateGB1998001641829.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9816418
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976936
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16B45/02
[2000/05]
CPC:
F16B45/027 (EP,US); F16B45/023 (EP,US)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Karabinerhaken[2000/05]
English:Improvements in and relating to karabiners[2000/05]
French:Perfectionnements relatifs aux mousquetons[2000/05]
Examination procedure03.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/20]
04.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR369884  (ERNST WLATNIGG [AT]);
 [XAY]US1392026  (MILTON STEVENSON ROBERT);
 [X]US1925816  (OSTER WALTER E);
 [Y]DE9110358U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.