blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973352

EP0973352 - Apparatus, and associated method for maintaining a selected quality of service level in a radio communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Purnadi, Rene
6713 Lyndale Drive
Watauga, TX 76148 / US
02 / Hsu, Liangchi
2614 Tillman Drive
Arlington, TX 76006 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Read, Matthew Charles, et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Former [2000/03]Jeffery, Kendra Louise, et al
Nokia IPR Department, Nokia House, Summit Avenue
Southwood, Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NZ / GB
Application number, filing date99305676.116.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011635116.07.1998         Original published format: US 116351
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973352
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973352
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973352
Date:22.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/38
[2000/03]
CPC:
H04W28/24 (EP,US); H04W28/26 (EP,US); H04W8/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/14]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und entsprechendes Verfahren zur Aufrechterhaltung einer gewählten Dienstgüte in einem Funkkommunikationssystem[2000/03]
English:Apparatus, and associated method for maintaining a selected quality of service level in a radio communication system[2000/03]
French:Appareil et méthode associée pour maintenir une qualité de service sélectionnée dans un systéme de radiocommunication[2000/03]
Examination procedure14.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
15.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2005Fee for grant paid
03.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT22.11.2006
[2008/17]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5497504  (ACAMPORA ANTHONY S [US], et al) [A] 1,22,23 * column 3, line 37 - line 62 * * column 6, line 20 - line 27 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 13 *;
 [A]EP0848560  (ROLM SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1,22,23 * column 4, line 3 - line 21 * * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 39 *;
 [A]US5412375  (WOOD DANIEL E [US]) [A] 1,22,23 * column 3, line 7 - line 33 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.