EP0974437 - Method for producing patterned shaped articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCA INC. 9-9 Soto-Kanda 1 Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states CCA INC. 9-9 Soto-Kanda 1 Chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Hiroshi 2074 Honjoh 3-chome Ashikaga-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305739.7 | 20.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | JP19980207344 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20734498 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0974437 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0974437 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B28B13/02, B28B1/00, B28B7/00, B44C1/26 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
B28B1/008 (EP);
B28B13/022 (EP);
B28B7/0029 (EP);
B28B7/34 (EP);
B44C5/00 (KR);
C04B41/00 (KR);
D06Q1/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/07] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von gemusterten geformten Gegenständen | [2000/04] | English: | Method for producing patterned shaped articles | [2000/04] | French: | Méthode pour la fabrication d'objets moulés avec motifs | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/34] | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.01.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.01.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0659526 (CCA INC [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0629478 (CCA INC [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0839618 (LB OFFICINE MECCANICHE SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 18 - line 52 * |