blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0977112

EP0977112 - Method and apparatus for controlling power of a computer system on a Lan (local area network) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2013  [2013/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Ryu, Chang-Hyun
608-104 Tap Maeul, 517 Yatap-dong, Bundang-gu
Sungnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Robinson, Ian Michael, et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Robinson, Ian Michael, et al
Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date99305799.122.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateKR1998003093430.07.1998         Original published format: KR 9830934
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977112
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977112
Date:24.03.2004
[2004/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2004
ClassificationIPC:G06F1/26, H04L12/12
[2004/13]
CPC:
H04L12/12 (EP,US); G06F1/26 (EP,KR,US); Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/05]G06F1/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/51]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Leistung eines Rechnersystems in einem lokalen Netzwerk[2000/05]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling power of a computer system on a Lan (local area network)[2000/05]
French:Procédé et dispositif de commande de puissance d'un systéme d'ordinateur sur un réseau local[2000/05]
Examination procedure17.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
02.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/04]
04.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
04.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
05.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
21.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
13.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
09.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0752637  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 29 * * column 4, line 23 - line 56; figures 2,3 *;
 [PA]GB2328046  (IBM [US]) [PA] 1,2,4 * page 6, line 1 - line 41; figure 4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.