EP0985656 - Process for the production of vinyl acetate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Michael James, BP Chemicals Limited Chertsey Road, Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | 02 /
Kitchen, Simon James, BP Chemicals Limited Hull Works, Salt End Hull, HU12 8DS / GB | 03 /
Bristow, Timothy Crispin, BP Chemicals Limited Hull Works, Salt End Hull HU12 8DS / GB | 04 /
Williams, Bruce Leo, BP Chemicals Limited Hull Works, Salt End Hull HU12 8DS / GB | 05 /
Clarke, Robert William, BP Chemicals Limited Hull Works, Salt End Hull HU12 8DS / GB | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Nicholas David, et al BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Perkins, Nicholas David, et al BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305875.9 | 23.07.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | GB19980017363 | 11.08.1998 Original published format: GB 9817363 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985656 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985656 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/055, C07C69/01 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
C07C67/055 (EP,US);
C07C69/01 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/055, C07C69/01 (EP,US);
C07C67/055, C07C69/15 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Herstellung von Vinylacetat | [2000/11] | English: | Process for the production of vinyl acetate | [2000/11] | French: | Procédé de préparation de l'acétate de vinyle | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 18.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2003 | CH | 20.08.2003 | CY | 20.08.2003 | LI | 20.08.2003 | DK | 20.11.2003 | PT | 20.01.2004 | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/31] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 20.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0847982 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-12* see comparison test p.6 *; page 2, lines 48-51 - page 3, lines 5-15 * |