EP0977175 - Method and apparatus for recognizing speech using a knowledge base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Naoko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suda, Aruna Rohra, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Wakai, Masanori, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305887.4 | 26.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | JP19980210979 | 27.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21097998 | JP19990201528 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20152899 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977175 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0977175 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977175 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/18 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
G10L15/1815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/17] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Spracherkennung unter Verwendung einer Wissensbasis | [2000/05] | English: | Method and apparatus for recognizing speech using a knowledge base | [2000/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de reconnaissance de la parole utilisant une base de connaissance | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Request for further processing for: | 26.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.11.2005 | NL | 09.11.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/24] | NL | 09.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0580793 ; | [Y]JPS6488600 ; | [Y]US4937870 (BOSSEMEYER JR ROBERT W [US]) [Y] 16-19,55-58 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0344017 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 23,24,62,63 * abstract * * figure 1 * | [XY] - KAWAHARA T ET AL, "HEURISTIC SEARCH INTEGRATING SYNTACTIC, SEMANTIC AND DIALOG-LEVEL CONSTRAINTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, ANDSIGNAL PROCESSING. (ICASSP),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1994), vol. CONF. 19, ISBN 0-7803-1776-9, pages II - 25-II-28, XP000528443 [X] 1-8,27,28,30-36,40-47,66,67,69-75,79-84 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0005] * * idem * [Y] 11,13,16-20,23-26,29,37-39,50,52,55-59,62-65,68,76-78 | [Y] - GLASS J ET AL, "MULTILINGUAL SPOKEN-LANGUAGE UNDERSTANDING IN THE MIT VOYAGER SYSTEM", SPEECH COMMUNICATION,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19950801), vol. 17, no. 1/02, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 1 - 18, XP000642167 [Y] 29,37-39,68,76-78 * figure 2 * * paragraph [2.1.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6393(95)00008-C | [X] - HITOSHI IIDA ET AL, "PREDICTING THE NEXT UTTERANCE LINGUISTIC EXPRESSIONS USING CONTEXTUAL INFORMATION", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION AND SYSTEMS,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, (19930101), vol. E76 - D, no. 1, ISSN 0916-8532, pages 62 - 73, XP000354887 [X] 1-8,27,28,30-36,40-47,66,67,69-75,79-84 * paragraph [02.2] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [07.4] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930804), vol. 017, no. 419, Database accession no. (P - 1585), & JP05080793 A 19930402 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD ;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,40 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 07, & JP01088600 A 19890403 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 25,26,64,65 * abstract * | [Y] - SETLUR A R ET AL, "Correcting recognition errors via discriminative utterance verification", PROCEEDINGS ICSLP 96. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING (CAT. NO.96TH8206), PROCEEDING OF FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING. ICSLP '96, PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, 3-6 OCT. 1996, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-3555-4, pages 602 - 605 vol.2, XP002139609 [Y] 11,13,20,50,52,59 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSLP.1996.607433 |